CA AB815 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 108, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8670.40 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 46101 of, to add Section 46008 to, and to repeal Section 46018 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to oil spills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil spill prevention and response fees: collection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB815 Ridley-Thomas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 815 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 108, Statutes of 2015.
2015-07-15 Approved by the Governor.
2015-07-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2015-07-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2015-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1756.).
2015-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-06-29SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2015-06-18SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-06-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-14SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2015-04-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-04-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1225.)
2015-04-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
2015-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2015-02-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2015-02-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8670.40Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code46008New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code46018Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code46101Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_815&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20150226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20150707_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20150715_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20150413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20150422_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20150430_0939AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20150609_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20150702_0954AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback