CA AB815 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 51460) to Chapter 3 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to instructional programs, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructional programs: State Seal of Biliteracy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-09-09 - Assembly - AB 815 BROWNLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB815 Brownley By Lowenthal (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 815 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 618, Statutes of 2011.
2011-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2011-09-23 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2011-09-09 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 3201.).
2011-09-07 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2363.).
2011-09-02 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-09-01 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-08-30 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2011-08-29 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
2011-08-15 In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-07-11 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-07-07 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
2011-06-16 Referred to Com. on ED.
2011-06-02 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-06-02 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 1796.)
2011-05-31 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-27 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-05-11 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-05-05 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-05-04 Read second time and amended.
2011-05-03 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 27).
2011-03-10 Referred to Com. on ED.
2011-02-18 From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2011-02-17 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51460New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_815&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20110217_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20110504_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20110527_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20110711_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20110830_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20110901_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20110920_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20111008_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20110427_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20110527_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20110602_1135AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20110629_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20110815_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20110825_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20110907_0512PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20110909_0648PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback