CA AB815 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 350, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4 of Chapter 258 of the Statutes of 2003, relating to state property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 815 CABALLERO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB815 Caballero By Denham (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 815 MA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 350, Statutes of 2010.
2010-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2010-09-03 Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2010-08-25 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 6639.)
2010-08-24 From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 24).
2010-08-16 Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2010-08-11 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2010-08-11 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4455.)
2010-08-04 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-08-03 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 2).
2010-06-30 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
2010-06-16 Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2010-06-15 Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2010-06-14 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2009-06-18 Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2009-06-04 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-06-03 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2019.)
2009-06-01 Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1819.).
2009-05-19 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-18 Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2009-05-14 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 13).
2009-05-07 Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2009-05-06 Read second time and amended.
2009-05-05 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-26 Read first time. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_815&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20090226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20090506_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20090518_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20090601_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20100614_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20100831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_bill_20100927_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20090505_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20090513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20090603_0953AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20100629_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20100802_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20100811_1054AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20100824_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_815_vote_20100825_1147AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback