CA AB813 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1473.7 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: postconviction relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 813 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 813 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB813 Gonzalez By Leno (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 813 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 813 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB813 Gonzalez By Leno (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 813 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 6527.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6469.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Senate amendments concurred in. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5022.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 1476.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1429.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1331.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1473.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |