CA AB813 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 357, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 357, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11126 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 290.04, 290.09, 1203.067, 3008, 9002, and 9003 of the Penal Code, relating to sex crimes.
Title
Sex offenders: punishment: parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-25 - Assembly - AB 813 FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB813 Fletcher (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 813 FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB813 Fletcher (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 813 FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 357, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-25 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2542.). | |
2011-07-14 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1865.). | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-22 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1566.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-10 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-25 | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.067 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 9002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 9003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |