CA AB811 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 28235 of and to add Article 6.1 (commencing with Section 27970) to, Chapter 4 of Division 6 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: Private Patrol Operators: registration and
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-26 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 27970 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 28235 | Amended Code | Citation Text |