CA AB808 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3212.13 to the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: hospital employers: presumption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 808 SKINNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 808 SKINNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-07 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-05-31 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2012-02-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-09 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1569.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18901.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |