CA AB804 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3040 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to hunting.
Title
Free hunting days.
Sponsors
Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Thurston Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 804 Megan Dahle Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB804 Megan Dahle et al. By Dahle (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 804 Megan Dahle Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB804 Megan Dahle et al. By Dahle (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 804 Megan Dahle Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 2737.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2291.). |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1720.) (June 29). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 1247.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 21). |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 3040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |