CA AB802 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18549 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Voter intimidation: public official: disqualification.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB802 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 802 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 802 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1712.). |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1534.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 18549 | New Code | See Bill Text |