CA AB800 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 367.3 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions: confidentiality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 800 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1875.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-27AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 26).
2019-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure367.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback