CA AB80 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-13)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17131.8 and 24308.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act: Federal Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021.

Sponsors

Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]
Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Sen. Steven Bradford [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Sen. Dave Cortese [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Sen. Maria Durazo [D]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Sen. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Sen. Steve Glazer [D]Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D]Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Sen. John Laird [D]Sen. Connie Leyva [D]
Sen. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Sen. Mike McGuire [D]Sen. Dave Min [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Sen. Josh Newman [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Richard Pan [D]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Sen. Richard Roth [D]
Sen. Susan Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]
Sen. Henry Stern [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Assembly - AB 80 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB80 Burke et al. By Skinner Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Assembly - AB 80 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2021.
2021-04-29 Approved by the Governor.
2021-04-26 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-04-26AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1180.).
2021-04-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 1176.)
2021-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2021-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2021-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-04-19SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-04-19SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-04-19SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2021-04-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-03-15SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-03SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-02SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-02-22SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-02-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-18SenateMeasure version as amended on February 17 corrected.
2021-02-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (February 18).
2021-02-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-02-16SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-02-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-01-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-01-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 26).
2021-01-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-01-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-01-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 13. Page 160.)
2021-01-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-01-11Assembly(Ayes 46. Noes 13. Page 108.)
2021-01-11AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2021-01-11AssemblyWithout reference to committee.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17131.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24308.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback