CA AB80 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 340, 1000, 1001, and 1202 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Presidential primary: election date.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Martin Garrick [R] | Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] |
Asm. Jared Huffman [D] | Asm. Bonnie Lowenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB80 Fong By De León (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - AB 80 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - AB 80 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-25 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-07-14 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1846.). | |
2011-06-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2011-06-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-25 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-04-11 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-11 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 903.) | |
2011-03-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). | |
2011-03-07 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-03-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-01-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. | |
2011-01-03 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 1000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 1202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 340 | Amended Code | Citation Text |