CA AB8 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 326, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 8594.15 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency services: hit-and-run incidents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-31 - Assembly - AB8 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB8 Gatto By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB8 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 326, Statutes of 2015.
2015-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2670.).
2015-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2201.).
2015-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17).
2015-07-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30).
2015-06-23SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
2015-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1764.)
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-06AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-01-16AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
2014-12-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2014-12-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8594.15New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_8&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_bill_20150706_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_bill_20150902_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_bill_20150928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_vote_20150323_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_vote_20150428_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_vote_20150602_1110AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_vote_20150630_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_vote_20150714_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_vote_20150817_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_vote_20150827_1203PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_8_vote_20150831_1226PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback