CA AB798 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69999.6 of, and to add and repeal Part 40.1 (commencing with Section 67420) of Division 5 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
College Textbook Affordability Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 798 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB798 Bonilla By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 798 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB798 Bonilla By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 798 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3169.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3171.). |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2741.). |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2644.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1922.) |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66409.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 67420 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69999.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |