CA AB798 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6529 of the Government Code, relating to joint exercise of powers.
Title
Joint powers agreement: public agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-27 - Assembly - AB 798 CHESBRO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB798 Chesbro By La Malfa (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 798 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB798 Chesbro By La Malfa (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 798 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2011-06-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 2074.). | |
2011-06-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-06-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1535.). | |
2011-06-14 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-04-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 980.) | |
2011-04-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6529 | Amended Code | Citation Text |