CA AB793 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.8 (commencing with Section 1546.8) to Title 12 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: reverse demands.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Corey Jackson [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Tina McKinnor [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 793 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 793 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 2144.) |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on April 19 corrected. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1546.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |