CA AB792 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17514 and 17592 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Business: mail solicitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 792 DUVALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1557.) | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12). | |
2009-05-05 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-30 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 17592 | Amended Code | Citation Text |