CA AB790 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14902 of the Vehicle Code, relating to identification cards.
Title
Identification cards: replacement: reduced fee.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB790 Mark Stone By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 790 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 790 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 2473.). |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 17). |
2017-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 1303.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 14902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |