CA AB79 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 38532 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 400 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electrical generation: hourly greenhouse gas emissions: electricity from unspecified sources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 79 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB79 Levine et al. By Stern (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 79 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-03 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 3276.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
2017-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2683.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-07-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 20).
2017-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1902.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 3).
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-03-21AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (March 15).
2017-03-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-03-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2017-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code38532New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code25229New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code398.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code400Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8400New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback