CA AB787 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.6 (commencing with Section 2149) to Chapter 2 of Division 2 of, and to repeal and add Section 2212 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: voter registration.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 787 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Asm Appropri (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 787 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Asm Appropri (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 2065.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2149 | New Code | See Bill Text |