CA AB787 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44062.1 , 44062.3, and 44125 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Smog check: vehicle repair assistance and retirement
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Assembly - AB 787 HILL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB787 Hill By Yee (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 787 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB787 Hill By Yee (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 787 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-13 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2010-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 6796.) | |
2010-08-26 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6707.) Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6735.) From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (August 26). | |
2010-08-25 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-25 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 4861.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14) | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-02-25 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-08-27 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7). | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1959.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |
2009-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44062.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44062.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |