CA AB784 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22251, 22303, 22304, 22305, 22365, and 22370 of, and to repeal Section 22381 of, the Financial Code, relating to consumer loans.
Title
Pilot Program for Increased Access to Responsible Small Dollar Loans.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 24). |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 22251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22371 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22373 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22374 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22375 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22376 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22377 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22381 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |