CA AB784 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1599.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care facilities.
Title
Long-term health care facilities: bed holds: appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 784 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-08-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-07-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2011-06-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1703.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-10 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1570.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1570.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1578 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1584.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1585.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1587 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1587.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1599.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14043.46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |