CA AB783 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2406 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 13401.5 of the Corporations Code, relating to professional corporations.
Title
Professional corporations: licensed physical therapists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 783 HAYASHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 783 HAYASHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2011-06-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-13 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1336.) | |
2011-04-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 13401.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |