CA AB781 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 26204, 34090.65, 56668.7, 57426, 61015, 61023, and 61102.5 to, and to add Article 7.5 (commencing with Section 65425) to Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 7284 and 7284.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: counties: unincorporated areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 781 PEREZ, J. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 781 PEREZ, J. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Measure version as amended on August 29 corrected. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wolk. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-15 | Measure version as amended on July 12 corrected. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-22 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-04-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2011-03-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 26204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 34090.65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 51230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 56668.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 57426 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 61015 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 61023 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 61102.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7284 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7284.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |