CA AB779 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 840 and 850 of, and to add Section 831.5 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 10737.4 of, and to add Sections 10737.3 and 10737.9 to, the Water Code, relating to groundwater.
Title
Groundwater: adjudication.
Sponsors
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 779 Wilson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB779 Wilson By Laird (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 779 Wilson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB779 Wilson By Laird (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 779 Wilson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 3441.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2652.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-08-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 27). |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2070.) |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1849.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and JUD. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 831.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10737.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10737.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10737.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |