CA AB779 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-06 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-06 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19805, 19850, and 19857 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gambling establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 779 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 779 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1903.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19854 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19857 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19859 | Amended Code | Citation Text |