CA AB779 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53909 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: financial disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 779 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB779 Cristina Garcia By Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 779 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB779 Cristina Garcia By Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 779 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6421.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) . |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4988.). |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1870.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53909 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65040.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65088 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65088.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65088.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65089 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65089.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65089.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21099 | Amended Code | Citation Text |