CA AB778 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6107 of the Government Code, relating to fees.
Title
Fees: military service records.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] |
Sen. Marty Block [D] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB778 Maienschein (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 778 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 778 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1620.). |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1224.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |