CA AB777 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Pan.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 14673.12 to the Government Code, relating to state property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State property: transfer: University of California.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB777 McCarty By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 777 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-08SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Pan.
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-09-03SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2021-09-03SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2021-09-03SenateOrdered to the Senate.
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 26).
2021-07-15SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-05-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-05-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2021-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14673.12New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback