CA AB776 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-12 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-12 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 9508.5 to the Elections Code, relating to school district elections.
Title
School district elections: school bond measures.
Sponsors
Asm. Matthew Harper [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. John Moorlach [R] |
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-12 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [07-13-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 776 HARPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 776 HARPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 1905.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (May 10). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9508.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |