CA AB774 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 128735 and 128736 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 774 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB774 Reyes By Pan (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 774 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB774 Reyes By Pan (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 774 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 3154.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2576.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1250.) |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (March 26). |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 128735 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 128736 | Amended Code | Citation Text |