CA AB77 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 7.6 (commencing with Section 11834.56) to Part 2 of Division 10.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance use disorder treatment services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance use disorder treatment services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11834.56New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback