CA AB77 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11343.4 and 11349.3 of the Government Code, relating to regulations.
Title
Regulations: effective dates and legislative review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11343.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11349.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |