CA AB77 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 77. Page 2106.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 77. Page 2106.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1352 of, to add Section 2850.5 to, and to repeal Section 712.5 of, the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 927.9, 11549.3, and 51018 of the Government Code, to amend Section 44299.91 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 12211 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 4785, 5018.1, 5080.18, 5096.650, 14538, 14539, 14549.5, 14553, 14572, 14591, 25751, 26052, 26055, 26060, 26062, 26063, 35600, 35605, 35625, 42977, 48704, 71300, 71301, 71302, 71303, 71304, and 71305 of, to add Sections 25711.5 and 25711.7 to, and to repeal Sections 4124 and 4515 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 309.5, 2851, and 5900 of, and to add Sections 318, 740.5, 854.5, and 2120 to, the Public Utilities Code, to add Section 104.22 to the Streets and Highways Code, to amend Section 85200 of, and to add Section 10001.7 to, the Water Code, and to repeal Section 34 of Chapter 718 of the Statutes of 2010, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Budget Act of 2013: public resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Assembly - AB 77 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 2 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB77 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB77 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB77 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB77 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Lay on Table (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 77 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB77 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB77 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB77 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB77 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Lay on Table (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 77 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 77. Page 2106.) |
2013-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 1386.). |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 1362.) Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1363.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 10. Noes 19. Page 1369.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1370.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1370.) Senate Rule 29.3 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 1337.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1391.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |