CA AB767 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12096.3 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 12097.1 of, and to add Article 4.3 (commencing with Section 12096.7) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to repeal Sections 71040 and 71041 of the Public Resources Code, relating to economic development.
Title
GO-Biz Information Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 767 QUIRK-SILVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB767 Quirk-Silva By Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB767 Quirk-Silva By Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 767 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB767 Quirk-Silva By Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB767 Quirk-Silva By Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 767 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6959.) |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5991.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5643.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3855.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12096.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12097.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71040 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71041 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |