CA AB765 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 261 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: rape.
Sponsors
Asm. K H Achadjian [R] | Sen. Tom Harman [R] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Assembly - AB 765 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-09 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1277.) | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1235.) | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2011-04-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 243 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |