CA AB759 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6801 of, and to repeal and add Section 6794 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to sanitary districts.
Title
Sanitary districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB759 Grayson et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - AB 759 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - AB 759 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1575.). |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1269.) |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 6794 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 6801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |