CA AB759 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Newman.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1300 of the Elections Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 24200 of the Government Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: county officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 759 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-08SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Newman.
2021-09-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-09-08SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2021-09-08SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-09-07SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2021-09-07SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 (b).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-23SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 1692.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 20.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-05-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2021-03-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code1300New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code24200Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB759
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB759#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB759#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB759#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB759#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB759#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB759#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB759#93AMD
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB759

Bill Comments

feedback