CA AB759 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 140, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 454.52 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity: electrical cooperatives: integrated resource plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - AB 759 DAHLE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB759 Dahle et al. By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 759 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 140, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2566.).
2017-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1938.).
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1391.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code454.52Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback