CA AB758 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 132651) to Division 12.7 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: Tri-Valley-San Joaquin Valley Regional Rail Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-16 - Assembly - AB 758 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB758 Eggman et al. By Beall (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 758 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB758 Eggman et al. By Beall (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 758 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 3540.). |
2017-09-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3535.) |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 3001.). |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 15). |
2017-09-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (September 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Page 2787.) |
2017-09-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2044.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 132651 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5431 | Amended Code | Citation Text |