CA AB758 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 24214, 24216, 24216.5, and 24216.6 of the Education Code, relating to state teachers' retirement.
Title
State teachers' retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-06 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-30 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 24214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24216.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24216.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_758&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_758_bill_20110217_introduced.html |