CA AB757 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26150, 26155, and 26202 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: concealed carry licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 26150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |