CA AB757 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 11016.7 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Department of Parks and Recreation: payroll review report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Assembly - AB 757 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB757 Roger Hern (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 757 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB757 Roger Hern (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 757 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2654.). |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1889.). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and N.R. & W. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1570.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11016.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |