CA AB753 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 683, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 683, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.88 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 753 Eduardo Garcia Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB753 Eduardo Garcia By Stone Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 753 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB753 Eduardo Garcia By Stone Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 753 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 683, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3094.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2464.). |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and EQ. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 4. Page 2155.) |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.88 | New Code | See Bill Text |