CA AB751 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 666.5 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 10851 of the Vehicle Code, relating to theft.
Title
Theft: motor vehicle: penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-25 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2010-01-12 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. In committee: Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 666.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 10851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |