CA AB75 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by augmenting Item 9840-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2019: augmentation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Assembly - AB 75 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB75 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 75 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB75 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 75 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4966.). |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4954.) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3856.). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2020-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 19). |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1165.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |