CA AB749 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10001, 10016, 10026, 10027, 10050, 10131, 10133.1, 10137, 10140.6, 10142, 10143.5, 10144, 10158, 10159, 10159.6, 10159.7, 10164, 10166.03, 10167, 10176, 10177, 10178, 10179, 10186.2, 10232.3, 10238, 10243, 10509, 10561, 11212, and 11267 of, to add Sections 10015.1, 10015.2, 10015.3, 10015.4, 10015.5, 10018.01, 10018.02, 10018.03, 10018.04, 10018.05, 10018.06, 10018.07, 10018.08, 10018.09, 10018.10, 10018.11, 10018.12, 10018.13, 10018.14, 10018.15, 10018.16, and 10018.17 to, to repeal Sections 10132 and 10160 of, and to repeal and add Section 10161.8 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to real estate.
Title
Real estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |