CA AB741 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1502 of, and to add Sections 1562.02 and 1562.03 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 5848.5, 11462.01, and 15610.47 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: community care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 741 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB741 Williams By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 741 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB741 Williams By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 741 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6450.). |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5368.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-05-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1809.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1502.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1502.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1562.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1562.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11462.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15610.47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5848.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |