CA AB740 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Accountability and Administrative Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 14718) to Chapter 2 of Part 5.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to information security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of General Services: drone cybersecurity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2023-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2023-03-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R.
2023-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2023-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14718New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback